DE HB175 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act alters various fees assessed by the Delaware Secretary of State. The Act provides that most changes to the fees and taxes assessed will take effect on August 1, 2017; however increases to the maximum franchise tax and the late penalty for the filing of an annual franchise tax report shall take effect for the tax year beginning January 1, 2017, and the increase of the assumed par value multiplier for calculation of the corporate franchise tax and the authorized shares multiplier for corporations with greater than 10,000 authorized shares for calculation of the corporate franchise tax shall take effect for the tax year beginning on January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 6, Title 8, And Title 12 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Various Fees And Taxes Charged By The Secretary Of State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-02 Signed by Governor
2017-06-15 Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 4 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-05-22 Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-05-18 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-05-17 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2017-05-11 Introduced in House and Assigned to House Administration Committee

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback