DE HB172 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This Bill limits a health insurers right to overpayment recovery to two years from the date of the original payment. The time limit does not apply where there is fraud or other intentional misconduct, when overpayment recovery is initiated by a self-insured plan, or where required by a federal or state plan. The bill also requires 30 days notice to healthcare providers regarding an attempt to recover overpayment as well as requiring insurers to have policies and procedures allowing challenge to the alleged overpayment. This bill affects all lines of health insurance including both individual and group policies.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Health Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-01-24 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-01-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-07-12 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2017-06-30 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 172 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-30 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 172 - Stricken in House | |
2017-06-28 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 172 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-17 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 172 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-05-11 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |