DE HB172 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires that a person elected to a state office or appointed to fill a vacancy in an elective state office, or who has filed as a candidate for an elective state office disclose the name and address of every nonprofit organization, civic association, community association, foundation, maintenance organization, or trade group incorporated in the State or having activities in the State, or both, of which the person is a council member or board member.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Disclosure Of Council Or Board Membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2009-06-16 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2009-06-11 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-11 | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-11 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-04 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-04 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-03 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2009-05-28 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |