DE HB166 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Like House Bill No. 166, House Substitute No. 1 for House Bill No. 166 establishes the Elevate Delaware program. Elevate Delaware will provide payments for tuition and auxiliary expenses, up to $10,000, for individuals to attend an approved non-credit certificate program. The Workforce Development Board will create a list of non- credit certificate programs eligible for the Elevate Delaware program and establish priorities based upon the skill requirements of employers in Delaware. It also allows the Department of Labor to provide payments to participants in Elevate Delaware to cover auxiliary expenses necessary to meet basic living expenses or purchase supplies necessary for the non-certificate program or employment upon completion of the program.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Elevate Delaware Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-20 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2021-05-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 4 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-13 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 166, and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |