DE HB141 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act authorizes the Family Court to interview a child outside the presence of the parties for the purpose of obtaining the child's testimony and ascertaining the truth of a matter asserted by a party to a Protection from Abuse proceeding. The Court may permit counsel to be present during the interview and ask the child questions. The Court may also permit a party who is not present for the interview to submit questions of fact for the Court to use in interviewing the child. Interviews under this Act must be made a part of the record.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Family Court Procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-08 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-12 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2017-05-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2017-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2017-04-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |