DE HB140 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill increases several revenue sources for the Transportation Trust Fund. The motor vehicle document fee is increased from 3.75% to 4.25%. The fee for late renewal of a driver’s license is increased from $1.15 to $10, and the fee for late renewal of vehicle registration is increased from $10 to $20. The fees for reinstatement of a suspended or revoked driver’s license are increased from $25 to $40 and $143.75 to $200, respectively. The fees for issuance of duplicate documents is raised, with the fee for duplicate driver’s license increased from $10 to $20, for duplicate titles from $25 to $50, for duplicate vehicle validation stickers from $1 to $5, and for duplicate registration cards from $2 to $10. The fee for a vehicle temporary tag is increased from $10 to $20. The fee for sale of driver’s licenses records is increased from $15 to $25. The fee to transfer a specific tag number from vehicle to vehicle is increased from $10 to $20. The fee to issue a title for a vehicle is increased from $25 to $35. The fee for issuance of a lien on an existing title is increased from $10 to $20. The effective date for these increases is generally October 1, 2015 to allow time for computer reprogramming and effective implementation.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 21 And 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Taxes And Fees Supporting The Transportation Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Roll Call Rescinded in Senate |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 11 YES 10 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (BOND) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Assigned to Bond Committee in Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 25 YES 16 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-14 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-05-14 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits, 2 Unfavorable |
2015-05-08 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |