DE HB120 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates a Delaware Commission on Indian Heritage and Culture.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Commission On Indian Heritage And Culture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | Stricken |
2015-06-25 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-04-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |