DE HB104 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill addresses the Behavioral and Mental Health Commission and functionally narrows its scope to peer review responsibilities. This peer review function provides independent oversight to Delawares mental health system without authority to force changes on the State. Much of the current broader responsibilities of the larger Commission overlap with the Governors Advisory Committee to DSAMH. The proposed changes do not replace or eliminate the Addiction Action Committee. This is merely to ensure that all commissions and committees have their own discrete area in which to focus.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Behavioral And Mental Health Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bentz [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Sen. Catherine Cloutier [R] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] |
Rep. Sean Lynn [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-16 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2019-04-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-04-16 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 104 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-04-11 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 104 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-21 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |