DE HB1 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

This Act builds on some of the legislation passed by the 148th General Assembly that addressed the wage gap between men and women. When employers ask prospective employees for their wage or salary history, it perpetuates disparities in pay based on gender from one job into another. This Act prohibits employers from inquiring into an applicant's compensation history. An applicant may voluntarily disclose the information if he or she wishes to do so, and the bill explicitly permits discussion and negation of compensation expectations between an employer and applicants, so long as the employer does not affirmatively seek compensation history in the course of discussion and negotiation. An employer is permitted to seek and confirm such information after an offer, including compensation, has been negotiated, made, and accepted. The effective date of the bill is delayed by 6 months to allow employers to update their policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Unlawful Employment Practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14 Signed by Governor
2017-06-06 Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 3 NO 2 ABSENT
2017-06-06 Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 3 NO 2 NOT VOTING
2017-06-06 Amendment SA 1 to HS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-06 Amendment SA 4 to HS 1 - Stricken in Senate
2017-06-06 Amendment SA 2 to HS 1 - Stricken in Senate
2017-05-18 Amendment SA 4 to HS 1 for HB 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-18 Amendment SA 3 to HS 1 for HB 1 - Sticken in Senate
2017-05-18 Amendment SA 3 to HS 1 for HB 1- Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-18 Amendment SA 2 to HS 1 for HB 1- Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-18 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2017-05-18 Amendment SA 1 to HS 1 for HB 1- Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-27 Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate
2017-04-27 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 2 NO 2 ABSENT
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-04-25 Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 1, and Assigned to Labor Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback