DC PR25-0851 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Resolution R25-0500, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007213
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Resolution R25-0500, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007213
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Justice Coordinating Council Information Sharing Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Criminal Justice Coordinating Council Information Sharing Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | Council | Resolution R25-0500, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007213 |
2024-06-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0500 |
2024-06-11 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-06-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-06-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |