DC PR25-0842 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Resolution R25-0526, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Resolution R25-0526, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | Council | Resolution R25-0526, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007219 |
2024-06-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0526 |
2024-06-11 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-06-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-06-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |