DC PR25-0834 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Resolution R25-0523, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007217
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Resolution R25-0523, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007217
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2024-LRSP-04A with MC Rental Preservation 2 LLC Approval Resolution of 2024
Title
Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2024-LRSP-04A with MC Rental Preservation 2 LLC Approval Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | Council | Resolution R25-0523, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007217 |
2024-06-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0523 |
2024-06-11 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-06-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-05-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0834 Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |