DC PR25-0701 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Resolution R25-0486, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Resolution R25-0486, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Health Care Alliance Enrollment Rulemaking Approval Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
District of Columbia Health Care Alliance Enrollment Rulemaking Approval Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Council | Resolution R25-0486, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004142 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0486 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-03-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |