DC PR25-0682 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Resolution R25-0456, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 003164
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Resolution R25-0456, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 003164
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid Crisis and Juvenile Crime Public Emergencies Extension Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Opioid Crisis and Juvenile Crime Public Emergencies Extension Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Council | Resolution R25-0456, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 003164 |
2024-03-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0456 |
2024-03-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |