DC PR25-0669 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Resolution R25-0457, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 003168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Resolution R25-0457, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 003168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Autonomous Vehicle Testing Permit Requirement Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Autonomous Vehicle Testing Permit Requirement Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Council | Resolution R25-0457, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 003168 |
2024-03-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0457 |
2024-03-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-02-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |