DC PR25-0646 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Resolution R25-0477, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Resolution R25-0477, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. DCCB-2024-F-0010 with Tycko & Zavareei LLP Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Contract No. DCCB-2024-F-0010 with Tycko & Zavareei LLP Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Council | Resolution R25-0477, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004129 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0477 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-02-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |