DC PR25-0644 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Cora Masters Barry Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Title
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Cora Masters Barry Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-04-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0644 Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0644 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54808/Introduction/PR25-0644-Introduction.pdf |