DC PR25-0591 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Resolution R25-0475, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Resolution R25-0475, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Sentencing Commission Sean Holihan Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Title
District of Columbia Sentencing Commission Sean Holihan Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Council | Resolution R25-0475, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004126 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0475 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-03-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-03-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0591 |
2024-03-22 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-03-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-03-21 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-03-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-01-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0591 Published in the DC Register |
2024-01-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-01-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |