DC PR25-0463 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-20 - Resolution R25-0302, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013906
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-20 - Resolution R25-0302, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013906
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarification of UDC PR Harris Exclusive Use Repeal Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Clarification of UDC PR Harris Exclusive Use Repeal Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-20 | Council | Resolution R25-0302, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013906 |
2023-10-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0302 |
2023-10-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-10-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-10-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |