DC PR25-0301 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Resolution R25-0319, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Resolution R25-0319, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Director of the District of Columbia Department of Human Resources Charles Hall, Jr. Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Title
Director of the District of Columbia Department of Human Resources Charles Hall, Jr. Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0319, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015017 |
2023-11-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-11-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0319 |
2023-10-13 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-10-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0301 |
2023-10-04 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-09-26 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2023-09-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor |
2023-06-30 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0301 Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |