DC PR25-0279 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-20 - Resolution R25-0288, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013887
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-20 - Resolution R25-0288, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013887
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Energy and Environment Richard Jackson Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Title
Department of Energy and Environment Richard Jackson Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-20 | Council | Resolution R25-0288, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013887 |
2023-10-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-10-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0288 |
2023-09-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-09-27 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-09-27 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0279 |
2023-09-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-08-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0279 Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2023-06-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |