DC PR25-0007 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-17 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-17 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Attorney General Civil Rights Enforcement Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Attorney General Civil Rights Enforcement Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-01-13 | Council | Resolution R25-0006, Effective from Jan 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 000384 |
2023-01-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0006 |
2023-01-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-01-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |