DC PR24-0911 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Resolution R24-0601, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011622
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Resolution R24-0601, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011622
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Battery Stewardship Program Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
Battery Stewardship Program Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Council | Resolution R24-0601, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011622 |
2022-09-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0601 |
2022-09-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-09-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |