DC PR24-0893 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-01 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0662
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-01 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0662
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Commemorative Works Committee Joe Coleman Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
District of Columbia Commemorative Works Committee Joe Coleman Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0662 |
2022-11-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-10-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-09-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0893 Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |