DC PR24-0273 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District Government Family Bereavement Leave Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
District Government Family Bereavement Leave Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-11 | Council | Resolution R24-0108, Effective from Jun 01, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006103 |
2021-06-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0108 |
2021-06-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-05-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |