DC PR24-0203 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Resolution R24-0100, Effective from May 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Resolution R24-0100, Effective from May 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Public Schools 2021-2022 Funding Stabilization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
District of Columbia Public Schools 2021-2022 Funding Stabilization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Council | Resolution R24-0100, Effective from May 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005159 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0100 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-05-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-04-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |