DC PR24-0030 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Resolution R24-0014, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001378
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

January 2021 Public Emergency Extension Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

January 2021 Public Emergency Extension Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-29CouncilResolution R24-0014, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001378
2021-01-19CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-01-15CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R24-0014
2021-01-15CouncilFinal Reading
2021-01-13CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback