DC PR23-0969 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revised Streatery and Pop Up Locations Programs Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revised Streatery and Pop Up Locations Programs Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-20CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-10-16CouncilResolution R23-0549, Effective from Oct 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 11868
2020-10-06CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0549
2020-10-06CouncilFinal Reading
2020-10-05CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback