DC PR23-0844 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Resolution R23-0443, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9005
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modification Nos. 02 and 03 to Contract No. DCAM-19-CS-RFQ-0001S with Thiha, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modification Nos. 02 and 03 to Contract No. DCAM-19-CS-RFQ-0001S with Thiha, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-24CouncilResolution R23-0443, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9005
2020-07-07CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0443
2020-07-07CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-07-07CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-06-23CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback