DC PR23-0801 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Resolution R23-0410, Effective from May 05, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5124
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Resolution R23-0410, Effective from May 05, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5124
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foreclosure Moratorium Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Foreclosure Moratorium Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Council | Resolution R23-0410, Effective from May 05, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5124 |
2020-05-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0410 |
2020-05-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-05-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-04-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |