DC PR23-0771 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - Resolution R23-0387, Effective from Apr 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4278
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To approved CA 23-458.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2019-LRSP-02A Approval Resolution of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-17CouncilResolution R23-0387, Effective from Apr 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4278
2020-04-07CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0387
2020-04-07CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-03-20CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0771 Published in the DC Register
2020-03-17CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-03-12CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback