DC PR23-0747 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development Limited Grant Making Authority for Check It Enterprises Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development Limited Grant Making Authority for Check It Enterprises Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-03-13 | Council | Resolution R23-0370, Effective from Mar 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2729 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0370 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-03-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |