DC PR23-0691 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Resolution R23-0379, Effective from Mar 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3545
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Resolution R23-0379, Effective from Mar 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3545
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Police Complaints Board Bobbi Strang Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Title
Police Complaints Board Bobbi Strang Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Council | Resolution R23-0379, Effective from Mar 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3545 |
2020-03-17 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0379 |
2020-03-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-02-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-02-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0691 |
2020-02-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0691 Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2020-02-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |