DC PR23-0682 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Resolution R23-0368 Effective from March 3, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To approve CA 23-423.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2018-lrsp-06a Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20CouncilResolution R23-0368 Effective from March 3, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3114
2020-03-03CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0368
2020-03-03CouncilFinal Reading
2020-02-18CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-02-04CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback