DC PR23-0676 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Resolution R23-0373, Effective from Mar 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Resolution R23-0373, Effective from Mar 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Interest Arbitration Award and Collective Bargaining Agreement between the District of Columbia Public Schools and the Office of the State Superintendent of Education and the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, District Council 20, Local 2921, AFL-CIO Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Interest Arbitration Award and Collective Bargaining Agreement between the District of Columbia Public Schools and the Office of the State Superintendent of Education and the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, District Council 20, Local 2921, AFL-CIO Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Council | Resolution R23-0373, Effective from Mar 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3116 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0373 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-02-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-01-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |