DC PR23-0560 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Resolution R23-0280, Effective from Dec 03, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16204
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Resolution R23-0280, Effective from Dec 03, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16204
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Precinct Boundary Changes Approval Emergency Approval Resolution of 2019
Title
Precinct Boundary Changes Approval Emergency Approval Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Council | Resolution R23-0280, Effective from Dec 03, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16204 |
2019-12-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0280 |
2019-12-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-12-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-11-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |