DC PR23-0551 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Resolution R23-0288, Effective from Dec 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 590
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Resolution R23-0288, Effective from Dec 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 590
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board of Directors Brian Kenner Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board of Directors Brian Kenner Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | Council | Resolution R23-0288, Effective from Dec 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 590 |
2020-01-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-17 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0288 |
2019-12-17 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-12-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0551 |
2019-11-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0551 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-10-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |