DC PR23-0527 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-15 - Resolution R23-0248, Effective from Nov 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-15 - Resolution R23-0248, Effective from Nov 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract DCRL-2017-R-0049 Modification Nos. 11, 12, and 13, with Lutheran Social Services of the National Capital Area Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Contract DCRL-2017-R-0049 Modification Nos. 11, 12, and 13, with Lutheran Social Services of the National Capital Area Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-15 | Council | Resolution R23-0248, Effective from Nov 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15183 |
2019-11-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0248 |
2019-11-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-11-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |