DC PR23-0515 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Resolution R23-0244, Effective from Oct 22, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14818
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Resolution R23-0244, Effective from Oct 22, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14818
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ad Hoc Committee Procedures Resolution of 2019
Title
Ad Hoc Committee Procedures Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-22 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Council | Resolution R23-0244, Effective from Oct 22, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14818 |
2019-11-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0515 Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-22 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0244 |
2019-10-22 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-10-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |