DC PR23-0485 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-18 - Resolution R23-0225, Effective from Oct 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13545
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-18 - Resolution R23-0225, Effective from Oct 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13545
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Justice Coordinating Council Information Sharing Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Criminal Justice Coordinating Council Information Sharing Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-18 | Council | Resolution R23-0225, Effective from Oct 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13545 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0225 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-10-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |