DC PR23-0478 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Resolution R23-0232, Effective from Oct 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13943
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Resolution R23-0232, Effective from Oct 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13943
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. NFPHC-2018-435-A Modification 3 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital and GW Medical Faculty Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Contract No. NFPHC-2018-435-A Modification 3 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital and GW Medical Faculty Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-25 | Council | Resolution R23-0232, Effective from Oct 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13943 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0232 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-10-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |