DC PR23-0402 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Health Functions Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Department of Health Functions Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-07-05 | Council | Resolution R23-0150, Effective from Jun 25, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7906 |
2019-06-25 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0150 |
2019-06-25 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-06-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |