DC PR23-0374 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Green Finance Authority Board Todd Monash Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Green Finance Authority Board Todd Monash Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-07-02CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-07-01CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR23-0374
2019-06-21CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0374 Published in the DC Register
2019-06-18CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2019-06-14CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback