DC PR23-0191 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Collective Bargaining Agreement between the American Federation of Government Employees, Local 1403, Compensation Unit 34, and the Public Service Commission of the District of Columbia Approval Resolution of 2019
Title
Collective Bargaining Agreement between the American Federation of Government Employees, Local 1403, Compensation Unit 34, and the Public Service Commission of the District of Columbia Approval Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-03-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0191 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2019-03-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0191 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42084/Introduction/PR23-0191-Introduction.pdf |