DC PR23-0093 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Parent-led Cooperative Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Parent-led Cooperative Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-02-15 | Council | Resolution R23-0013, Effective from Feb 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2065 |
2019-02-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0013 |
2019-02-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-02-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |