DC PR23-0087 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Agendized; not considered at the request of CM Gray
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Agendized; not considered at the request of CM Gray
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To disapprove Reprog. 23-4
Title
Reprogramming No. 23-0004 Disapproval Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Council - Agendized; not considered at the request of CM Gray (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Council | Agendized; not considered at the request of CM Gray |
2019-02-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0087 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |