DC PR22-0996 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Resolution R22-0625 Effective from November 30, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13162
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commission On Health Equity Alicia Wilson Reappointment Resolution Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission On Health Equity Alicia Wilson Reappointment Resolution Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30CouncilResolution R22-0625 Effective from November 30, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13162
2018-11-30CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R22-0625
2018-11-05CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-10-16CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR22-0996
2018-10-16CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-09-21CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR22-0996 Published in the DC Register
2018-09-18CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2018-09-17CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback