DC PR22-0915 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Resolution R22-0537 Effective from June 26, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7735
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Resolution R22-0537 Effective from June 26, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7735
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications To Contract No. Cw19745 With First Vehicle Services, Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Cw19745 With First Vehicle Services, Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | Council | Resolution R22-0537 Effective from June 26, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7735 |
2018-06-26 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0537 |
2018-06-26 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-26 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-06-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |