DC PR22-0646 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-29 - Resolution R22-0338 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13462
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-29 - Resolution R22-0338 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13462
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Capitol Paving of D.C., Inc.
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Dcka-2013-c-0007 With Capitol Paving Of D.c., Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-29 | Council | Resolution R22-0338 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13462 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0338 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-11-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |