DC PR22-0568 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-24 - Resolution R22-0289 Effective from November 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12042
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-24 - Resolution R22-0289 Effective from November 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12042
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2018 Income Tax Secured Revenue Bond, General Obligation Bond And General Obligation And Income Tax Secured Bond Anticipation Note Issuance Authorization Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2017
Title
Fiscal Year 2018 Income Tax Secured Revenue Bond, General Obligation Bond And General Obligation And Income Tax Secured Bond Anticipation Note Issuance Authorization Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-24 | Council | Resolution R22-0289 Effective from November 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12042 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0289 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-11-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-10-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |